FITZJOHNS FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hand out weekly food parcels from Christ Church, Prince Edwards Road, Lewes to provide food, essential toiletries and household items to individuals and families in need residing in Lewes and local surrounding areas. We receive donations of food and financial support from many local businesses, schools, churches and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £27,158 from 7 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 06 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ronald Ranta | Chair | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Terence Turner | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Bostwick | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
RODERIC SYLVESTER COLEMAN OWENS | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|||||
ALYSON OWENS | Trustee | 08 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Neil Graham Fisher | Trustee | 06 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.57k | £44.10k | £31.41k | £76.98k | £107.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.71k | £21.69k | £21.04k | £51.48k | £87.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.87k | £8.74k | £7.80k | £23.48k | £27.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROVIDE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PERSONS RESIDING IN LEWES AND SURROUNDING LOCAL AREAS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FOOD,ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR THE DISTRIBUTION BY OTHER CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY IN LEWES AND LOCAL SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church
Prince Edwards Road
LEWES
BN7 1BL
- Phone:
- 01273488237
- Email:
- fitzjohnsfoodbank@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window