YOUTH WITH A MISSION HOLMSTED MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the Christian faith worldwide by, but not exclusively by, teaching of the Bible, worship and praise, evangelism, study, prayer, children and youth works and community service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 July 2019: CIO registration
- YWAM HOLMSTED MINISTRIES (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abigail Barnes | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raphael David Hartmann | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Laura Mudd | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.59k | £178.94k | £202.47k | £242.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.08k | £150.52k | £178.20k | £200.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 04 JUL 2019 AMENDED ON 18 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE BY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, TEACHING OF THE BIBLE, WORSHIP AND PRAISE, EVANGELISM, STUDY, PRAYER, CHILDREN AND YOUTH WORKS AND COMMUNITY SERVICE; (2) TO RELIEVE POVERTY BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS BY ANY MEANS SUCH AS ACTS OF SERVICE, GIFTS, DONATIONS, CONTRIBUTIONS, LOANS AND ADVANCES WITH OR WITHOUT INTEREST; (3) TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED TO THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLMSTED MANOR
STAPLEFIELD ROAD
CUCKFIELD
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH17 5JF
- Phone:
- 01444440229
- Email:
- sbishop@holmsted.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window