THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE'S PRESHUTE, MARLBOROUGH

Charity number: 1184256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robin Notton Trustee 06 September 2020 None on record
MAJOR JEREMY YORK MBE, BA Trustee 07 April 2016
KING'S SHROPSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY AND THE HEREFORDSHIRE LIGHT INFANTRY OFFICER'S ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Sarah Musgrave M.A. Trustee 06 September 2020 None on record
Anne Notton Trustee 06 September 2020 None on record
Linda Morgan Trustee 18 May 2021 None on record
David Beacom Trustee 06 September 2020 None on record
Sally Cripps Trustee 06 September 2020 None on record
Paul Lefever Trustee 06 September 2020 None on record
LYDIA BAUER Trustee 15 April 2018
PRESHUTE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION Received: On time
MANTON PRESCHOOL ASSOCIATION Overdue by 475 days
Rev Peter Sainsbury Trustee 18 April 2021 None on record
SIMON BONHAM Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record
Neil Croucher Trustee 18 May 2021 None on record
Marcia Johnson Trustee 06 September 2020 None on record
Alastair James Barr Trustee 18 May 2021 None on record