NORTH DERBYSHIRE MINERS' WELFARE TRUST FUND SCHEME

Charity number: 514389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £66.00k £8.79k £9.60k £10.77k £11.97k
Total expenditure £43.97k £25.12k £30.09k £22.13k £21.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A