Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHIAS, BRIGHTON
Charity number: 1185491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Thomas James Holbird | Chair | 28 April 2017 | ||||||
ANN MARGARENT CATHERINE TAYLOR | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ADRIAN LOMAS | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SHAUN JONNES | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Wood | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELENA SIAN LOMAS | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kat Gardner | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE RACHEL PALMER FRY | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY MARK HUGO PALMER FRY | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Flo Sparham | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Shepherd | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH MIDDLETON | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BENJAMIN JONES | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS ROBERT GARDNER | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUE PAMELA ADAMS | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Laura Batten | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.