TAVISTOCK ATHLETIC CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1184126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 November 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 February 2021 109 days late Download