Trustees FOREST OF DEAN SCULPTURE TRUST CIO
Charity number: 1185309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Bowden | Chair | 21 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Penny | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Burnett | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Michael Wood | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Khady Gueye | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Grace Storey | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leo Samuel Goatley | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Allan Stonyer | Trustee | 21 August 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.