Financial history EAST MIDLANDS PACEMAKER FUND

Charity number: 514465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £33.79k £57.73k £24.22k £3.56k £49
Total expenditure £81.82k £57.57k £73.51k £6.57k £10.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A