Accounts and annual returns SICKLE CELL AWARENESS UK
Charity number: 1186396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 June 2022 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 701 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 March 2022 | 304 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1066 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window