Accounts and annual returns SPECIAL NEEDS IMPROVEMENT PROJECTS SWANSEA

Charity number: 514504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 February 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required