SPECIAL NEEDS IMPROVEMENT PROJECTS SWANSEA

Charity number: 514504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.02k £6.87k £3.62k £4.59k £383
Total expenditure £7.59k £11.67k £2.02k £1.76k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A