Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PHILIP'S KELSALL
Charity number: 1184938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Rischmiller | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Davies | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Knight | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Susan Banks | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Pearson | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Margaret Grant | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Clifton | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kershaw | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Gaskarth | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Roberts | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Diggle | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Gray | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.