PERSON TO PERSON CITIZEN ADVOCACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of people with a learning disability within Mid Glamorgan. To assist those people to realise their full potential and to lead fulfilling lives. To assist those people to obtain their full rights and privileges as a citizen. To provide long term friendship and support. To provide information to people with a learning disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £40,500 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Caerphilly
Governance
- 04 October 2019: CIO registration
- 11 March 2020: Funds received from 1047265 PERSON TO PERSON CITIZEN ADVOCACY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALUN THOMAS | Chair | 09 May 1995 |
|
|
||||
Marc Andrew Evans | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Davies | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Gornicki | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Will Thomas | Trustee | 09 May 1995 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.48k | £30.50k | £40.50k | £40.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.50k | £34.46k | £37.83k | £37.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.50k | £30.50k | £40.50k | £40.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY WITHIN SOUTH WALES AND TO ASSIST THOSE PEOPLE TO REALISE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL TO LEAD FULFILLING LIVES BY THE PROVISION OF A SERVICE CALCULATED TO: I. ASSIST PERSONS AS DEFINED ABOVE TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS A CITIZEN; II. PROVIDE LONG TERM FRIENDSHIP AND SUPPORT; AND III. PROVIDE INFORMATION TO PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BARGOED YMCA
AERON PLACE
BARGOED
CF81 8JA
- Phone:
- 07436102162
- Website:
-
persontoperson.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window