Trustees STEEP IN NEED
Charity Number: 1187284

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Stanley Rush | Chair | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Frost | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Hall | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Sarel Keys | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey James Dale MA, FRICS | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Michael Thackery White FRICS | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Augusta Robinson | Trustee | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.