CANOLFAN GYMDEITHASOL TUDWEILIOG (TUDWEILIOG COMMUNITY CENTRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community centre for various clubs and organisations to meet weekly and monthly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 16 November 1983: Standard registration
- CANOLFAN GYMDEITHASOL TUDWEILIOG (Working name)
- CANOLFAN CYMDEITHASOL TUDWEILIOG (TUDWEILIOG COMMUNITY CENTRE) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CADI THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALUN ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AILWYN ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GWENAN ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWIN GRIFFITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALED WYN HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ENID OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £969 | £1.37k | £1.24k | £10.64k | £2.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.69k | £1.04k | £1.19k | £1.02k | £1.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 23 AUGUST 1983
Charitable objects
A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF TUDWEILIOG IN THE COUNTY OF GWYNEDD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CALSSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TUDWEILIOG IN THE COUNTY OF GWYNEDD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cae R Mab
Tudweiliog
PWLLHELI
Gwynedd
LL53 8NA
- Phone:
- 07979490200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window