Accounts and annual returns MUSIC4ALL NORWICH
Charity number: 1187046
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 216 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 06 January 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 110 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 114 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window