EASTHAMPSTEAD PARK COMMUNITY SCHOOL FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support and advance the education of students in Easthampstead Park Community School in particular by raising funds to provide and/or assist in the provision of equipment, facilities, resources, and experiences that extend and enrich learning while promoting positive close co-operation and communication between parents, carers, alumni, school staff, governors, and community volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 20 August 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rene Colette Rastall Mrs | Chair | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Sumner | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Blakemore | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark David Hooper | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Ferguson | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY TEMPERTON | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|||||
JANET ANN SUMNER | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|||||
LIz Cook | Trustee | 20 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.35k | £6.00k | £5.69k | £6.46k | £11.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £3.06k | £3.00k | £8.84k | £8.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: A) PROVIDING AND/OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES, RESOURCES AND EXPERIENCES THAT EXTEND AND ENRICH LEARNING. B) PROMOTING POSITIVE CLOSE CO-OPERATION AND COMMUNICATION BETWEEN PARENTS, CARERS, ALUMNI, SCHOOL STAFF, GOVERNORS AND COMMUNITY VOLUNTEERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EASTHAMPSTEAD PARK COMMUNITY SCHOOL
RINGMEAD
BRACKNELL
RG12 8FS
- Phone:
- +441344304567
- Email:
- epcsfriends@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window