ALLIANCE FOR CAMPHILL COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1188751
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL GREEN Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Erwin Josephus Maria Wennekes Trustee 15 April 2021 None on record
BRIDGET BENNETT Trustee 20 January 2020 None on record
Julian David Haxby Mr Chair 21 November 2018
GLOBE COMMUNITY PROJECT Received: On time
Peter Bateson Trustee 31 January 2020
THE MOUNT CAMPHILL COMMUNITY LIMITED
Carmel Hannah Iveson Trustee 15 April 2021 None on record
JACQUELINE JOHANNESSEN Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record