PONTYPRIDD BOYS GRAMMAR SCHOOL (1939/45 WAR MEMORIAL FUND)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awards grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 21 December 1983: Standard registration
- MEMORIAL FUND IN CONNECTION WITH PONTYPRIDD GRAMMAR SCHOOL ( NOW KNOWN AS COED Y LAN COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Geoffrey Cuff | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jayne Hazell | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iwan Meredydd Davies | Trustee | 30 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jones | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Philip James | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Compton Carey | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MR JOHN COLLINS | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID TIMOTHY WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN GOWER ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILLIP JAMES BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £558 | £556 | £492 | £495 | £643 | |
|
Total expenditure | £700 | £650 | £100 | £600 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 OCTOBER 1949 SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 22 DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS OR GRANTS.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 CHERITON GROVE
TONTEG
PONTYPRIDD
CF38 1PF
- Phone:
- 01443203153
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window