WALTHAM FOREST LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1184861
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Waltham Forest Lions Club is part of Multiple District 105 which covers the UK. As a Lions Clubs our purpose is to "serve local communities" and Lions principles to which the clubs compulsory adhere include "acting to benefit the public interest".

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022

Total income: £4,258
Total expenditure: £4,258

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 2019: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MUHAMMED HAMID SHAIKH Chair 01 July 2020
None on record
Humayun Ikram Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Saima Islam Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £3.06k £3.17k £4.26k
Total expenditure £3.06k £3.17k £4.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 October 2023 177 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 24 October 2023 177 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 February 2023 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 27 February 2023 303 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Waltham Forest Lions Club CIO
462a Hoe Street
Walthamstow
London
E17 9AH
Phone:
02081234523