CYMDEITHAS RHIENI-ATHRAWON YSGOL GLAN CLWYD/THE PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION OF YSGOL GLAN CLWYD

Charity number: 514662
Charity reporting is overdue by 151 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 151 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 151 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 January 2020 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 05 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required