Accounts and annual returns STANDING TALL CIO

Charity number: 1185476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 02 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window