THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S, ALFRISTON WITH LULLINGTON

Charity number: 1185209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan David Porter Trustee 09 September 2020 None on record
Kelly Anne Ellis Trustee 09 September 2020 None on record
Paul Simon Wright Trustee 17 June 2021 None on record
Christopher Paul Duenas Trustee 09 September 2020 None on record
David Marcus Ostler Trustee 09 September 2020 None on record
Diana Margaret Monteath- Wilson Trustee 08 July 2014 None on record
Rev Stephen Stuckes Chair 01 July 2018 None on record
William Francis Rendall Trustee 10 April 2018
ABBEYFIELD SOUTH DOWNS LIMITED Received: On time
Patricia Jane Ellis Trustee 30 April 1995 None on record
Pauline Mary Kennard Trustee 09 September 2020 None on record
Carol Hodson Trustee 10 September 2014
CRIMINAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE Received: On time
Sylvia Jean Elizabeth Daw Trustee 15 April 2021
CHILDREN WITH CANCER FUND (POLEGATE) Received: On time
David John Withers Trustee 30 April 2009 None on record
Kenneth Edwards Trustee 30 April 2018 None on record