Financial history 1ST CHINLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 514718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £140.29k £10.93k £18.67k £19.04k £11.40k
Total expenditure £12.48k £20.79k £33.50k £5.33k £18.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.73k £18.17k £183