1ST CHINLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 514718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Anthony Waters Trustee 09 February 2017 None on record
Ruth Celia Edgar Trustee 18 January 2019 None on record
GEORGINA COOPER Trustee 15 July 2014 None on record
Dale Ryan Carroll Trustee 03 September 2021 None on record
MARTIN PETER BERRIMAN Trustee 15 July 2014 None on record
Ian Stefanuti Trustee 03 September 2021 None on record
Mark Andrew Krassowski Chair 14 July 2015 None on record