HARDWAY ELSON & DISTRICTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1189009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our activities include: Providing rooms for the Hampshire Council sponsored Pre-School Group, along with assisting local Charity Groups and providing a safe & welcoming space for use by our local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £162,300
Total expenditure: £197,700

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 2020: CIO registration
  • 06 December 2022: Funds received from 301834 HARDWAY ELSON AND DISTRICTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATIONS
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • HEDCA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ronald Ian Jeffery Trustee 18 June 2024
None on record
Alison Wagstaff Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Gary Jeffery Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.74k £73.25k £126.47k £162.30k
Total expenditure £61.50k £77.99k £159.44k £197.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £19.14k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 02 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 11 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HEDCA
COOMBE ROAD
GOSPORT
PO12 4JB
Phone:
02392588023
Website:

hedca.org