Accounts and annual returns QUEENSWELL COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1185421
Charity reporting is overdue by 164 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 164 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 164 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 June 2023 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 June 2023 505 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 March 2021 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required