Accounts and annual returns KINGSTON UPON HULL UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 514867
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 December 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required