ST MARY'S WASHINGTON PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Parents Teachers Association working with and for and with St Mary's County Primary School in Washington, West Sussex. Our primary purpose is to raise funds to support the education and environment of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 September 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerry Baldey | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Lamb | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.43k | £2.93k | £2.10k | £4.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.08k | £2.58k | £5.15k | £7.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2024 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 July 2023 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS C E PRIMARY SCHOOL
SCHOOL LANE
WASHINGTON
PULBOROUGH
RH20 4AP
- Phone:
- 01903892401
- Email:
- stmarysptaw@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window