Trustees WOOLWICH CREATIVE DISTRICT TRUST

Charity number: 1189180
Charity reporting is up to date (61 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Paul Sullivan Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Philip John Watkins Trustee 28 January 2021
THE MINISTRY OF STORIES
Received: On time
Mary Rose Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
Ben Howarth Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
Michael Lewis Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
Sally Manser Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
Ines Anderson Trustee 23 April 2020
None on record
Allan MacCarthy Trustee 31 January 2020
ST LUKE CHARLTON PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Cllr Denise Hyland Trustee 07 June 2019
CENTRE FOR LOCAL ECONOMIC STRATEGIES LIMITED
Received: On time
Joy Salaja Trustee 07 June 2019
RUSHMOOR HEALTHY LIVING
Received: On time