Accounts and annual returns GRACE'S DREAM

Charity number: 1186408
Charity reporting is overdue by 561 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 196 days
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 196 days
Annual return 06 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 561 days
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 561 days
Annual return 06 December 2020 16 October 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2020 05 November 2021 30 days late Download Open in new window