Accounts and annual returns BISHOP AUCKLAND TABLE TENNIS CLUB

Charity number: 1185690
Charity reporting is overdue by 501 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 136 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 501 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 501 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 February 2022 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window