NEWLYN FISHING, INDUSTRY AND SEAFARERS HERITAGE (FISH) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the past, present and future of the Fishing, Industry, Community and Culture of Newlyn
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £2,999 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 08 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Derath May Durkin LLB | Chair | 27 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael Larsen | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Professor Lucy Blue | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John David Edmund Gallagher | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Elliott | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Elizabeth Ratcliffe BA Hons | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Cathryn Bick | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Russell Bick | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £754 | £14.94k | £16.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £14.84k | £757 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 21 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 April 2022 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 24 April 2022 | 206 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF NEWLYN, CORNWALL IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES, WORKSHOPS, TRADITIONAL CRAFTS DEMONSTRATIONS AND OTHER EVENTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
KILN COTTAGE
38 Boase Street
Newlyn
PENZANCE
TR18 5JE
- Phone:
- 07850599719
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window