Trustees BEING THE CURE
Charity number: 1188077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Butcher | Chair | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Phil Hurst | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Clay | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tejswurree Ramgoolam | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Poloni | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Manjit Gill | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Faiza Chaudhary Iqbal | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Amiss | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Atif Janjua | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Javed | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.