Trustees ALCESTER MALE VOICE CHOIR
Charity number: 514970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW MARCUS SPEIRS | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GEORGE ADAMS | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER TULLETT | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ALABASTER | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT EDWARDS | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN FREDERICK ROBINSON | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALDERSON | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS BRAMPTON | Trustee | 23 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PAGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH LAND | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.