BUSY FINGERS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Little Downham Busy Fingers Pre-School is a small pre-school in Little Downham with a maximum capacity of 30 children per day. The practice looks after children aged of 2 years 6 months to when they start reception year at school. The school have a manager a book keeper and 5 part time practitioners ranging between Level 2 and 3.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £161,550 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 18 March 2020: CIO registration
- 18 July 2024: Funds received from 308133 BUSY FINGERS PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imogen Ford | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Hills | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Bowman | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kendle Hanslip | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Blair | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hazell | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA OGILVIE | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 24/02/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £200.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £197.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £161.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 February 2023 | 21 January 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 February 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 162 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Busy Fingers Pre School
Main Street
Little Downham
ELY
CB6 2ST
- Phone:
- 01353698633
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window