THE SCHINZEL-GIEDION SYNDROME FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Proving support to families caring for a child with SGS, raising awareness of SGS and facilitating and supporting medical research that will help to improve the quality and length of life of children living with SGS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
- Denmark
- United States
Governance
- 13 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Nuala Summerfield | Chair | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aleksandra Blagunovski | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dana Bradley | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.26k | £20.43k | £59.30k | £85.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.79k | £8.36k | £4.96k | £64.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH SCHINZEL-GIEDION SYNDROME FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- · RAISING AWARENESS OF SCHINZEL-GIEDION SYNDROME THROUGH THE CREATION OF INFORMATION RESOURCES DESIGNED FOR THE SCIENTIFIC AND MEDICAL COMMUNITIES AND ALSO FOR FAMILIES, AVAILABLE INTERNATIONALLY; · ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING RESEARCH INTO THE UNDERLYING CAUSES AND POTENTIAL THERAPIES FOR SCHINZEL-GIEDION SYNDROME, THROUGH CREATION OF AN INTERNATIONAL PATIENT REGISTRY AND THROUGH DEVELOPMENT OF LINKS WITH RELEVANT INTERNATIONAL RESEARCH ORGANISATIONS; ·IMPROVING ACCESS TO PUBLISHED SCIENTIFIC INFORMATION ABOUT SCHINZEL-GIEDION SYNDROME AND THE HEALTH ISSUES AFFECTING CHILDREN WITH SCHINZEL-GIEDION SYNDROME, CURATED IN AN UNDERSTANDABLE WAY AND AVAILABLE ON THE SCHINZEL-GIEDION SYNDROME FOUNDATION’S WEBSITE, FOR FAMILIES INTERNATIONALLY; AND ·TO SUPPORT RESEARCH INITIATIVES AND TO SUPPORT CHILDREN WITH SCHINZEL-GIEDION SYNDROME AND THEIR FAMILIES, INTERNATIONALLY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lowfield Hall
Poles Lane
Lowfield Heath
CRAWLEY
RH11 0PX
- Phone:
- +447957168815
- Email:
- contact@sgsfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window