WORRALL MALE VOICE CHOIR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Singing group giving pleasure to old people's organisations, hospitals and open concerts to local churches and the public to promote male voice choral music. We are happy to assist local churches or groups in fund raising activities. We will consider any community project in the Sheffield area. We also are regular providers of singing at weddings etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 11 April 1984: Standard registration
- 08 September 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1185933 WORRALL MALE VOICE CHOIR MUSICAL GRANTS FOUNDATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.44k | £38.92k | £10.80k | £8.26k | £19.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.84k | £15.64k | £18.36k | £18.97k | £12.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.25k | £1.60k | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 01 March 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 27 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 5 SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 06 AUGUST 1990, 20 FEBRUARY 1995, 10 FEBRUARY 1997 AND 22 FEBRUARY 2010 AS AMENDED ON 26 MAY 2017 as amended on 05 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
2.1 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART OF SINGING BY ASSISTING IN, AND TAKING PART IN, CONCERTS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES AND RAISING FUNDS FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR ORGANISATIONS FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. 2.2 SUBJECT TO 2.1 ABOVE, ANY SURPLUS INCOME MAY BE APPLIED IN ASSISTING AND SUPPORTING SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window