ROTARY CLUB OF DERBY SOUTH TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CURRENT PRINCIPAL ACTIVITY IS TO RAISE FUNDS FOR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL CHARITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 14 May 1984: Standard registration
- 09 January 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 May 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Angus | Chair | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Heaton | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY CAROLYN REYNOLDS | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/06/2020 | 26/06/2021 | 26/06/2022 | 26/06/2023 | 26/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.63k | £131.79k | £34.92k | £23.10k | £18.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.32k | £112.36k | £28.83k | £20.86k | £12.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 June 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 June 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 June 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Poppyfields Drive
Mickleover
Derby
DE3 9GB
- Phone:
- 01332511074
- Email:
- peterangus46@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
derbysouth-rotary.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window