Financial history ST PETERS YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 515042
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2013 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £8.29k £8.74k £6.86k £5.15k £160
Total expenditure £6.82k £7.09k £4.40k £5.19k £1.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A