NEW DAWN CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to provide a safe, friendly, child oriented and impartial environment within which supported contact can take place between children and parents/family members not living together. The New Dawn Child Contact Centre is an accredited member of the National Association of Child Contact Centres and has agreed to their practice standards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- NDCCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.75k | £10.49k | £15.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.26k | £8.93k | £11.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.16k | £2.89k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE AND UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN OF SEPARATED FAMILIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: • PROVIDING A SAFE, SECURE AND NEUTRAL LOCATION WHERE SUCH CHILDREN CAN SPEND TIME WITH THE PARENT THEY NO LONGER LIVE WITH, OR OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS THEY WOULD NOT OTHERWISE SEE; • PROVIDING THE HIGHEST QUALITY, CHILD FOCUSSED SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHILDREN OF SEPARATED FAMILIES; • FACILITATING THE CONTACT ARRANGEMENTS IN WAYS WHICH ARE IN THE BEST INTERESTS OF THE CHILDREN; • ASSISTING THE FAMILIES TO MOVE FORWARD AND, WHERE APPROPRIATE, TO MOVE TO CONTACT ARRANGEMENTS AWAY FROM THE CENTRE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window