Trustees STUDENT PUBLICATION ASSOCIATION CIO
Charity number: 1187383

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Cole | Trustee | 28 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Ward-Perkins | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justine Noble | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anttoni James Numminen | Trustee | 04 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Rix | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lewis Brooks | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Louise Collins | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aubrey Edward Lewis Allegretti | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Scott | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.