ROYAL AIR FORCE VIDEO GAMING AND ESPORTS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing opportunities for the whole-force RAF to participate in Esports from initial experience through to all levels of competition, including international representation. Encouraging Service personnel to take up Esports to develop their mental agility, morale, team ethos, determination, and technical proficiency, as contribution to military efficiency and the defence of the realm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- RAF ESPORTS (Working name)
- RAFVGEA (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 November 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 November 2023 | 28 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 March 2023 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 March 2023 | 146 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY OF HER MAJESTY’S ARMED FORCES IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO: (1) PROMOTING AND MAINTAINING THE MENTAL WELFARE AND MORALE; (2) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS; OF MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL AIR FORCE; AND IN PARTICULAR, (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION), THE TRUSTEES MAY FURTHER THE OBJECT THROUGH ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THE PARTICIPATION IN, AND PROVISION OF OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR, VIDEO GAMING AND ESPORTS IN THE ROYAL AIR FORCE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window