Joey’s Legacy Rescue & Rehoming

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We rescue, rehabilitate and rehome dogs who are in need of care. We have a no destruction policy and never put a healthy dog to sleep. Full assessment is completed whilst the dogs are in our care to ensure that when rehomed they can be matched to the right family. We will then offer life time advice, support, and rescue back up to the dogs which we have rehomed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 November 2019: CIO registration
- 08 April 2024: Funds received from 1181685 BOXER AND BULLY SAVIOURS
- JOEY'S LEGACY BOXER RESCUE LIVERPOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICKY HEELEY | Chair | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA DAVIES | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Smith | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.82k | £44.70k | £52.69k | £71.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.34k | £45.61k | £31.30k | £59.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Nov 2019 as amended on 18 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS, IN PARTICULAR BOXERS, BOXER CROSSES AND SIMILAR BREEDS, IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Lichfield Close
Bootle
L30 1PU
- Phone:
- 07928 080776
- Email:
- joeyslegacybr@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window