BALI NYONGA-UK CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief and assistance of people in Cameroon and Nigeria who are the victims of war or natural disaster, trouble, or catastrophe in particular by the supply of food, water, provision of shelter, health care provision, medical aid and educational materials to such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 November 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Cameroon
- Nigeria
Governance
- 04 February 2020: CIO registration
- BALI CULTURAL AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION UK CHARITY (Previous name)
- BCDA-UK CHARITY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMANUEL GANG AKUMBOM FOMUSO | Chair | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cletus Bobga | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emmanuel Tahmundungnji Ngwa | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frida Ngendad Nubila | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Dohnji | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vincent Lebga Nwana | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Denis Nji Njomia | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Celestine Voma | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Dohvoma | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/11/2020 | 12/11/2021 | 12/11/2022 | 12/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 November 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 November 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 November 2022 | 24 September 2023 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 November 2022 | 24 September 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 November 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 November 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 November 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 November 2020 | 12 October 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Feb 2020 as amended on 27 Sept 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN CAMEROON AND NIGERIA WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF FOOD, WATER, PROVISION OF SHELTER, HEALTH CARE PROVISION, MEDICAL AID AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS TO SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Welbeck Gardens
BEDFORD
MK41 8RW
- Phone:
- 07768240548
- Email:
- egfomuso@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window