THE COUNTIES HERITAGE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1188823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CHF supports the conservation of arts and heritage and the training of conservation craft skills, all for the public benefit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,675
Total expenditure: £4,265

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire
  • Lincolnshire
  • Northamptonshire
  • Rutland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Ransome Wallis FRSA FRBS Chair 21 February 2020
None on record
Charlotte Brudenell Trustee 21 February 2020
None on record
Stephanie Hutton Trustee 21 February 2020
None on record
Mark Newton FRICS Trustee 21 February 2020
None on record
Manuela Cridland FCA Trustee 21 February 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £4.14k £4.25k £10.68k
Total expenditure £0 £1.36k £1.42k £4.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 November 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 November 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HOME FARM HOUSE
LILFORD
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 5SG
Phone:
01832720510
Website:

No information available