Financial history YORK SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 515145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £15.58k £19.08k £18.64k £13.22k £482
Total expenditure £16.90k £18.31k £15.97k £10.55k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A