ALICE RUGGLES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alice Ruggles Trust works to raise both public and professional awareness of stalking (including coercive control) and its dangers. We participate in training events, speak in schools, and undertake social media campaigns directed particularly at young people. We also campaign for measures that will bring about lasting improvements in the management of perpetrators and the protection of victims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £58,385 from 3 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 November 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Clive Lance Neville Ruggles | Chair | 13 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Claire Louise Alderton | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tiffany Cater | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARK WILLIAM JOHN HAGGAN | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Charlotte Kay | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Joy Mellins | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catriona Helen Kate Sibert | Trustee | 13 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susan Elizabeth Hills | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas David Ruggles | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.98k | £38.53k | £35.07k | £32.45k | £91.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.01k | £46.03k | £37.78k | £46.44k | £60.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | £500 | £58.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF THE PUBLIC FROM THE DANGERS OF COERCIVE CONTROL AND STALKING AND TO BRING ABOUT LASTING IMPROVEMENTS IN THE MANAGEMENT OF PERPETRATORS AND THE PROTECTION OF VICTIMS SPECIFICALLY BY:- (1)RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS; (2)ENSURING THAT RELEVANT LEGISLATION IS EFFECTIVE AND ADHERED TO, AND IN PARTICULAR TO ENSURE THAT STALKING OFFENCES RESULT IN IMMEDIATE ACTION BOTH TO PROTECT THE VICTIM AND TO DEAL EFFECTIVELY WITH THE PERPETRATOR.THE TRUST WILL ACHIEVE THIS BY, FOR EXAMPLE, PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR POLICE, MILITARY AND OTHER RELEVANT AGENCIES; (3)CAMPAIGNING FOR IMPROVED LEGAL MEASURES RELATING TO STALKING AND RELATED OFFENCES; AND (4)SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO WAYS TO IMPROVE THE PROTECTION OF VICTIMS OF STALKING AND THE MANAGEMENT OF PERPETRATORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARGATE HOUSE
MAIN STREET
TUR LANGTON
LEICESTER
LE8 0PJ
- Phone:
- 07566878795
- Email:
- info@alicerugglestrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window