CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM MOVEMENT CHURCH, PINNACLE OF CHRIST'S SOVEREIGNTY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the Christian faith and the gospel of Jesus Christ for the benefit of the public in accordance with the teachings of Jesus Christ as contained in the Holy Bible, in particular but not exclusively by: Providing and maintaining places of worship for members of the church and the Christian community; Providing spiritual growth to people of all races and colour through Church se
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Nigeria
Governance
- 08 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Oduguwa | Chair | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
OLUMIDE B OLUSOGA | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oluwaseun John Badejo | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.62k | £16.37k | £23.13k | £19.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.18k | £9.65k | £15.95k | £33.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF JESUS CHRIST AS CONTAINED IN THE HOLY BIBLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING PLACES OF WORSHIP FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH AND THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY; · PROVIDING SPIRITUAL GROWTH TO PEOPLE OF ALL RACES AND COLOUR THROUGH CHURCH SERVICES AND OTHER CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES; · TRAINING CHRISTIANS FOR MINISTRY AND SERVICE WITHIN THE CHURCH AND WIDER WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARRIS ACADEMY FALCONWOOD
THE GREEN
WELLING
DA16 2PE
- Phone:
- 07956563648
- Email:
- Majex@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window