Accounts and annual returns #WILLDOES

Charity number: 1187099
Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 47 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 47 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 20 July 2023 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 20 July 2023 81 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window